Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Surveyors

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0478 /CH0356
Title
Procurement - Qualification Based Selection - Land Surveying Services
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0735 (SB0729/CH0405)
Title
Technical Study on Changes in Forest Cover and Tree Canopy in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0848 (SB0320)
Title
Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0991
Title
Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1254
Title
Governmental Units - Designation of Individual in Responsible Charge of Land Surveying and Property Line Surveying Activities
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0320 (HB0848)
Title
Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0729 /CH0405 (HB0735)
Title
Technical Study on Changes in Forest Cover and Tree Canopy in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0478 /CH0356 Procurement - Qualification Based Selection - Land Surveying Services Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0735 (SB0729/CH0405) Technical Study on Changes in Forest Cover and Tree Canopy in Maryland Delegate Healey 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0848 (SB0320) Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order Delegate McComas 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/01/2019 - 11:30 AM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0991 Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules
HB1254 Governmental Units - Designation of Individual in Responsible Charge of Land Surveying and Property Line Surveying Activities Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0320 (HB0848) Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Rules
3/05/2019 - 11:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0729 /CH0405 (HB0735) Technical Study on Changes in Forest Cover and Tree Canopy in Maryland Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 405
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM