Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Talbot County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0204
Title
Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0768 (SB0917/CH0353)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1085 (SB0955)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Channel Marker Regional Wellness Center
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1090 (SB0822)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - St. Luke's Preschool
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1102 (SB0824)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - St. Michaels Family YMCA
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1111 (SB0953)
Title
Natural Resources - Eastern Shore - Deer Firearms Season
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1203 (SB0954)
Title
Talbot County - Deer Management Permit - Use of Rifles
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0822 (HB1090)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - St. Luke's Preschool
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0824 (HB1102)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - St. Michaels Family YMCA
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0954 (HB1203)
Title
Talbot County - Deer Management Permit - Use of Rifles
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0955 (HB1085)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Channel Marker Regional Wellness Center
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0204 Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - Funding Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0768 (SB0917/CH0353) Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit Delegate Otto 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1085 (SB0955) Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Channel Marker Regional Wellness Center Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 AM
HB1090 (SB0822) Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - St. Luke's Preschool Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 AM
HB1102 (SB0824) Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - St. Michaels Family YMCA Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 AM
HB1111 (SB0953) Natural Resources - Eastern Shore - Deer Firearms Season Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1203 (SB0954) Talbot County - Deer Management Permit - Use of Rifles Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Recommitted to Environment and Transportation (Delegate Stein)
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0822 (HB1090) Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - St. Luke's Preschool Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 AM
SB0824 (HB1102) Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - St. Michaels Family YMCA Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 AM
SB0954 (HB1203) Talbot County - Deer Management Permit - Use of Rifles Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0955 (HB1085) Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Channel Marker Regional Wellness Center Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM