Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Talbot County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0156 /CH0371 (SB0171/CH0372)
Title
Talbot County Board of Education – Start Date of Term for Members
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0865 (SB0405)
Title
Creation of a State Debt – Talbot County – Avalon Theatre
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1432
Title
Food Stamp Program - Summer Supplement for Children - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1485 /CH0531
Title
Natural Resources - Shellfish - Harvesting by Wharf Owners
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1499 /CH0533 (SB0575)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Self-Insured Employers - Suspected Fraud Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1756 (SB1190)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - St. Michaels Family YMCA
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0171 /CH0372 (HB0156/CH0371)
Title
Talbot County Board of Education - Start Date of Term for Members
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0405 (HB0865)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Avalon Theatre
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1056 /CH0606
Title
Rural Health Collaborative Pilot
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1190 (HB1756)
Title
Creation of a State Debt – Talbot County – St. Michaels Family YMCA
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0156 /CH0371 (SB0171/CH0372) Talbot County Board of Education – Start Date of Term for Members Delegate Mautz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Ways and Means
2/01/2018 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0865 (SB0405) Creation of a State Debt – Talbot County – Avalon Theatre Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 AM
HB1432 Food Stamp Program - Summer Supplement for Children - Pilot Program Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1485 /CH0531 Natural Resources - Shellfish - Harvesting by Wharf Owners Delegate Fisher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1499 /CH0533 (SB0575) Workers' Compensation - Self-Insured Employers - Suspected Fraud Reporting Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Economic Matters
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1756 (SB1190) Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - St. Michaels Family YMCA Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 AM
SB0171 /CH0372 (HB0156/CH0371) Talbot County Board of Education - Start Date of Term for Members Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0405 (HB0865) Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Avalon Theatre Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1056 /CH0606 Rural Health Collaborative Pilot Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 606
Finance
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1190 (HB1756) Creation of a State Debt – Talbot County – St. Michaels Family YMCA Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:56 PM