Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Tax Returns

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0194 /CH0049
Title
State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Requirement to Register - Exemptions
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1536 (SB0546)
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Rates - Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1782 /CH0037
Title
Health Insurance - Individual Market Stabilization (Maryland Health Care Access Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0107
Title
Public Safety - Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention and the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center - Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0187 /CH0010 (HB0161)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0387 /CH0038
Title
Health Insurance – Individual Market Stabilization (Maryland Health Care Access Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0546 (HB1536)
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Rates - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0194 /CH0049 State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Requirement to Register - Exemptions Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Economic Matters
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1536 (SB0546) Higher Education - Tuition Rates - Exemptions Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1782 /CH0037 Health Insurance - Individual Market Stabilization (Maryland Health Care Access Act of 2018) Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0107 Public Safety - Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention and the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center - Reporting Requirements Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (119-0)
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0187 /CH0010 (HB0161) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0387 /CH0038 Health Insurance – Individual Market Stabilization (Maryland Health Care Access Act of 2018) Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Finance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0546 (HB1536) Higher Education - Tuition Rates - Exemptions Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:57 PM