Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Tax Sales

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0366
Title
Tax Sales - Delinquent Water Bills - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0935 /CH0289
Title
Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 410-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1035 /CH0114 (SB0439)
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1144
Title
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1177
Title
Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 425-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1273 (SB0928/CH0212)
Title
Somerset County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0439 (HB1035/CH0114)
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0928 /CH0212 (HB1273)
Title
Somerset County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0366 Tax Sales - Delinquent Water Bills - Prohibition Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0935 /CH0289 Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 410-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Ways and Means
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1035 /CH0114 (SB0439) Baltimore City - Tax Sales Delegate Oaks 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1144 Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1177 Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 425-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1273 (SB0928/CH0212) Somerset County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0439 (HB1035/CH0114) Baltimore City - Tax Sales Senator McFadden 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0928 /CH0212 (HB1273) Somerset County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2015 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM