Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Tax Sales

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0241 (SB0167)
Title
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0453
Title
Tax Sales - Water Liens - Moratorium
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0861 /CH0243
Title
Tax Sales - Foreclosure of Right of Redemption - Naming of Defendants
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1168 /CH0618 (SB0957/CH0619)
Title
Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank Authorities
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1496
Title
Tax Sales - Property Maintenance and Nuisance Condition Violation Judgments
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1567
Title
Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Release of Liens on Vacant Property PG 413-17
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1573 /CH0819
Title
Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 411-17
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0167 (HB0241)
Title
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0753 /CH0242
Title
Tax Sales - Foreclosure of Right of Redemption - Naming of Defendants
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0957 /CH0619 (HB1168/CH0618)
Title
Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank Authorities
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0241 (SB0167) Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0453 Tax Sales - Water Liens - Moratorium Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0861 /CH0243 Tax Sales - Foreclosure of Right of Redemption - Naming of Defendants Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Ways and Means
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1168 /CH0618 (SB0957/CH0619) Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank Authorities Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 618
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1496 Tax Sales - Property Maintenance and Nuisance Condition Violation Judgments Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1567 Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Release of Liens on Vacant Property PG 413-17 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1573 /CH0819 Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 411-17 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 819
Ways and Means
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0167 (HB0241) Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Budget and Taxation (Senator Conway)
Budget and Taxation
2/01/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB0753 /CH0242 Tax Sales - Foreclosure of Right of Redemption - Naming of Defendants Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0957 /CH0619 (HB1168/CH0618) Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank Authorities Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 619
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM