Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Telephones

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0041
Title
Public Schools - Boards of Education - Anonymous Two-Way Text Messaging Tip Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0212
Title
Vehicle Laws - Use of Handheld Telephone While Driving - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0305
Title
Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0365 /CH0262
Title
Public Schools - Bullying, Harassment, and Intimidation Policies - Update
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0439 /CH0485
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Door-to-Door Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0512 (SB0430)
Title
Guardianship of a Disabled Person - Communication and Notification Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0744
Title
Senior Call-Check Service Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0771 /CH0277 (SB0071)
Title
Public Schools - Administration of Diabetes Care Services - Guidelines
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1066
Title
Montgomery County Public Schools - Communications in Spanish MC 37-16
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1103
Title
Health Care Practitioners - Use of Teletherapy
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1120
Title
Family Law - Automatic Injunction
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1266 (SB0881)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers, Sales, and Resales
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1379 (SB0813)
Title
Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed Parents
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1601
Title
Criminal Law - Threat Against State or Local Official - Law Enforcement Officer
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0071 (HB0771/CH0277)
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Diabetes Management Program
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328 (HB0220)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0424
Title
Emergency Number Systems Board - 9-1-1 Trust Fund - Planning Costs
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0430 (HB0512)
Title
Guardianship of a Disabled Person - Communication and Notification Rights
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0657
Title
Task Force to Study the Impact of Cell Phone Use in Public Schools
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0686
Title
Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - Information Sharing (Carl Henn's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0690
Title
State Labor Relations Board and the State Higher Education Labor Relations Board - Election and Certification of Exclusive Representatives
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0813 (HB1379)
Title
Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed Parents
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0881 (HB1266)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers, Sales, and Resales
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1084
Title
Adult Entertainment Establishments - National Human Trafficking Resource Center Hotline Information - Sign Posting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0041 Public Schools - Boards of Education - Anonymous Two-Way Text Messaging Tip Programs Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/28/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0212 Vehicle Laws - Use of Handheld Telephone While Driving - Penalties Delegate Turner 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2016 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0305 Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required Notice Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Economic Matters
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0365 /CH0262 Public Schools - Bullying, Harassment, and Intimidation Policies - Update Delegate Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Ways and Means
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0439 /CH0485 Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Door-to-Door Sales Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 485
Economic Matters
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0512 (SB0430) Guardianship of a Disabled Person - Communication and Notification Rights Delegate Kittleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0744 Senior Call-Check Service Program - Establishment Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0771 /CH0277 (SB0071) Public Schools - Administration of Diabetes Care Services - Guidelines Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1066 Montgomery County Public Schools - Communications in Spanish MC 37-16 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1103 Health Care Practitioners - Use of Teletherapy Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1120 Family Law - Automatic Injunction Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1266 (SB0881) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers, Sales, and Resales Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1379 (SB0813) Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed Parents Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1601 Criminal Law - Threat Against State or Local Official - Law Enforcement Officer Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0071 (HB0771/CH0277) Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Diabetes Management Program Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2016 - 3:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0328 (HB0220) Criminal Procedure - Expungement Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0424 Emergency Number Systems Board - 9-1-1 Trust Fund - Planning Costs Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0430 (HB0512) Guardianship of a Disabled Person - Communication and Notification Rights Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0657 Task Force to Study the Impact of Cell Phone Use in Public Schools Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0686 Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - Information Sharing (Carl Henn's Law) Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0690 State Labor Relations Board and the State Higher Education Labor Relations Board - Election and Certification of Exclusive Representatives Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0813 (HB1379) Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed Parents Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0881 (HB1266) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers, Sales, and Resales Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1084 Adult Entertainment Establishments - National Human Trafficking Resource Center Hotline Information - Sign Posting Requirements Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM