Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Theaters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0415 (SB0419)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Downs Park Amphitheater
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0793 (SB0567)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Center for the Visual and Performing Arts Amphitheater
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0840 /CH0634 (SB0699)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Theater and Entertainment Center License
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0903
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers, Sales, and Resales
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0985 (SB0986)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Olney Theatre Center
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1206
Title
Baltimore County - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Classes and Rates
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1266 (SB0881)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers, Sales, and Resales
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1269 (SB0223)
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1304 (SB1036)
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1639
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Arena Players
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0223 (HB1269)
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0419 (HB0415)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Downs Park Amphitheater
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0567 (HB0793)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Center for the Visual and Performing Arts Amphitheater
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0744
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - The Maryland Theatre
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0881 (HB1266)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers, Sales, and Resales
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1036 (HB1304)
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0415 (SB0419) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Downs Park Amphitheater Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 9:00 AM
HB0777 Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0793 (SB0567) Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Center for the Visual and Performing Arts Amphitheater Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 12:00 PM
HB0840 /CH0634 (SB0699) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Theater and Entertainment Center License Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0903 Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers, Sales, and Resales Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0985 (SB0986) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Olney Theatre Center Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1206 Baltimore County - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Classes and Rates Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1266 (SB0881) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers, Sales, and Resales Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1269 (SB0223) Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1304 (SB1036) Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1639 Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Arena Players Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 10:00 AM
SB0223 (HB1269) Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0419 (HB0415) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Downs Park Amphitheater Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 12:00 PM
SB0567 (HB0793) Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Center for the Visual and Performing Arts Amphitheater Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 10:00 AM
SB0744 Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - The Maryland Theatre Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB0881 (HB1266) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers, Sales, and Resales Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1036 (HB1304) Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM