Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Threats -see also- Harrassment; Violence

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0005 (SB0161)
Title
Crimes - Hate Crimes - Use of an Item or a Symbol to Threaten or Intimidate
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0074
Title
Public Safety - Crime of Violence - Witness Intimidation
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0132 (SB0205)
Title
Public Safety - Crime of Violence - Witness Intimidation
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0198
Title
Election Law - Online Campaign Material - Use of Deepfakes
Sponsor
Delegate Cain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0212 (SB0178)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Advertisements
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0231 (SB0530)
Title
Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0501 (SB0365)
Title
Criminal Law - Child Pornography and Exhibition and Display of Obscene Items to Minors
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0547 (SB0455)
Title
Health - Maryland Children's Service Animal Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0643 (SB0701)
Title
End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0923 (SB0385)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0964
Title
Employment Discrimination – Definitions of “Employee” and “Harassment” (Workplace Civility Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139 (SB1010)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1309
Title
Criminal Procedure - Law Enforcement Procedures - Use of Force
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1352
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Coercive Control
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0161 (HB0005)
Title
Crimes - Hate Crimes - Use of an Item or a Symbol to Threaten or Intimidate
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0178 (HB0212)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Prices Listed on Dealer Websites
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0205 (HB0132)
Title
Public Safety - Crime of Violence - Witness Intimidation
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0365 (HB0501)
Title
Criminal Law - Child Pornography and Exhibition and Display of Obscene Items to Minors
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0407
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Senior and Vulnerable Adult Asset Recovery Unit
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0455 (HB0547)
Title
Health - Maryland Children's Service Animal Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0530 (HB0231)
Title
Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0701 (HB0643)
Title
End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0727
Title
Insurance Law - Application to Direct Primary Care Agreements - Exclusion
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0925
Title
Criminal Law - Dangerous and Potentially Dangerous Dogs - Classification and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0943 (HB1568)
Title
Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety (Safe Care Act)
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 (HB1139)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0005 (SB0161) Crimes - Hate Crimes - Use of an Item or a Symbol to Threaten or Intimidate Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
1/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0074 Public Safety - Crime of Violence - Witness Intimidation Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0132 (SB0205) Public Safety - Crime of Violence - Witness Intimidation Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0198 Election Law - Online Campaign Material - Use of Deepfakes Delegate Cain 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0212 (SB0178) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Advertisements Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0231 (SB0530) Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0501 (SB0365) Criminal Law - Child Pornography and Exhibition and Display of Obscene Items to Minors Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0547 (SB0455) Health - Maryland Children's Service Animal Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0643 (SB0701) End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act) Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
Judiciary
HB0923 (SB0385) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0964 Employment Discrimination – Definitions of “Employee” and “Harassment” (Workplace Civility Act) Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1139 (SB1010) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1309 Criminal Procedure - Law Enforcement Procedures - Use of Force Delegate Davis, D.M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1352 Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Coercive Control Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0161 (HB0005) Crimes - Hate Crimes - Use of an Item or a Symbol to Threaten or Intimidate Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0178 (HB0212) Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Prices Listed on Dealer Websites Senator Hough 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0205 (HB0132) Public Safety - Crime of Violence - Witness Intimidation Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0365 (HB0501) Criminal Law - Child Pornography and Exhibition and Display of Obscene Items to Minors Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0407 Office of the Attorney General - Senior and Vulnerable Adult Asset Recovery Unit Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2020 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
Appropriations
SB0455 (HB0547) Health - Maryland Children's Service Animal Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0530 (HB0231) Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0701 (HB0643) End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0727 Insurance Law - Application to Direct Primary Care Agreements - Exclusion Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0925 Criminal Law - Dangerous and Potentially Dangerous Dogs - Classification and Requirements Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0943 (HB1568) Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety (Safe Care Act) Senator Hayes 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1010 (HB1139) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 5:10 PM