Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Timesharing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0422 (SB0991)
Title
Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0947 /CH0495
Title
Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Railing Inspections (Jonathan's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0401 /CH0494
Title
Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Railing Inspections (Jonathan's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0991 (HB0422)
Title
Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - Prohibited
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0422 (SB0991) Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - Prohibited Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0947 /CH0495 Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Railing Inspections (Jonathan's Law) Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 495
Environmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0401 /CH0494 Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Railing Inspections (Jonathan's Law) Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0991 (HB0422) Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - Prohibited Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM