Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Tobacco

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0071 (SB0514)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0139 (SB0320)
Title
Tobacco Tax - Premium Cigars - Rate
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162
Title
Comptroller - Taxpayer Protection Act
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0775
Title
Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum Age
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1069 /CH0293
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Entertainment Concessionaire and Facility Licenses PG 311-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1115 /CH0732
Title
Montgomery County - Cigarette Retailers - County License Fee MC 12-16
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1431
Title
Vehicle Laws - Prohibition Against Smoking in Vehicle Containing Young Child
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1485
Title
Other Tobacco Products - Local Laws for Sale and Distribution - Intent of the General Assembly
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1504
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Distribution of Tobacco Products to Minors - Prohibition and Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0114
Title
Health - Prohibition on Distribution of Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices to Minors - Civil Enforcement
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0292
Title
Tax Assessments - Appeals Procedures - Application for Revision or Claim for Refund
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0320 (HB0139)
Title
Tobacco Tax - Premium Cigars - Rate
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0514 (HB0071)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0071 (SB0514) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0139 (SB0320) Tobacco Tax - Premium Cigars - Rate Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0162 Comptroller - Taxpayer Protection Act Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Judiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0775 Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum Age Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1069 /CH0293 Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Entertainment Concessionaire and Facility Licenses PG 311-16 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1115 /CH0732 Montgomery County - Cigarette Retailers - County License Fee MC 12-16 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 732
Economic Matters
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/06/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1431 Vehicle Laws - Prohibition Against Smoking in Vehicle Containing Young Child Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1485 Other Tobacco Products - Local Laws for Sale and Distribution - Intent of the General Assembly Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1504 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Distribution of Tobacco Products to Minors - Prohibition and Enforcement Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Economic Matters
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Rules
SB0114 Health - Prohibition on Distribution of Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices to Minors - Civil Enforcement Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0292 Tax Assessments - Appeals Procedures - Application for Revision or Claim for Refund Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0320 (HB0139) Tobacco Tax - Premium Cigars - Rate Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0514 (HB0071) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM