Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Tobacco

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0185 /CH0773
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Distribution of Tobacco Products to Minors - Prohibition and Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0396 (SB0326)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Shop Licenses
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0500
Title
Rental Units, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Smoking Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0600 (SB0175)
Title
Public Health - Use of Medical Oxygen in Residential Dwellings - Smoking and Open Flame Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0703 (SB0113)
Title
Public Health - Tobacco Control Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0747 /CH0139
Title
Public Health - Cigarette Restitution Fund Programs - Modifications
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0855
Title
The Smoke-Free Multifamily Housing Promotion Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1445 (SB0775)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Shop Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0113 (HB0703)
Title
Public Health - Tobacco Control Funding
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0175 (HB0600)
Title
Public Health - Use of Medical Oxygen in Residential Dwellings - Smoking and Open Flame Restrictions
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0326 (HB0396)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Shop Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0669
Title
Tobacco Products - Minimum Age and Civil Fines
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0775 (HB1445)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Tobacconist License
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0185 /CH0773 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Distribution of Tobacco Products to Minors - Prohibition and Enforcement Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 773
Economic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0396 (SB0326) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Shop Licenses Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0500 Rental Units, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Smoking Restrictions Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0600 (SB0175) Public Health - Use of Medical Oxygen in Residential Dwellings - Smoking and Open Flame Restrictions Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0703 (SB0113) Public Health - Tobacco Control Funding Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0747 /CH0139 Public Health - Cigarette Restitution Fund Programs - Modifications Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0855 The Smoke-Free Multifamily Housing Promotion Act Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1445 (SB0775) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Shop Licenses Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0113 (HB0703) Public Health - Tobacco Control Funding Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/01/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB0175 (HB0600) Public Health - Use of Medical Oxygen in Residential Dwellings - Smoking and Open Flame Restrictions Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0326 (HB0396) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Shop Licenses Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0669 Tobacco Products - Minimum Age and Civil Fines Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0775 (HB1445) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Tobacconist License Harford County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM