Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Toilets

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0141 (SB0782)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Public Buildings - Diaper-Changing Facilities in Restrooms
Sponsor
Delegate Knotts
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0507 /CH0096 (SB0263/CH0095)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Banquet Facility License
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0263 /CH0095 (HB0507/CH0096)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Banquet Facility License
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 /CH0705
Title
Environment – Graywater – Residential Use
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0782 (HB0141)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Public Buildings - Diaper-Changing Facilities in Restrooms
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0141 (SB0782) State Finance and Procurement - Public Buildings - Diaper-Changing Facilities in Restrooms Delegate Knotts 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0507 /CH0096 (SB0263/CH0095) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Banquet Facility License Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0263 /CH0095 (HB0507/CH0096) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Banquet Facility License Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0496 /CH0705 Environment – Graywater – Residential Use Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 705
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0782 (HB0141) State Finance and Procurement - Public Buildings - Diaper-Changing Facilities in Restrooms Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:57 PM