Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Torts -see also- Libel and Slander; Med Malp; Wrongful Death

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0041
Title
Immunities - Associations, Organizations, and Charities - Liability of Agents and Volunteers
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104
Title
Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0113 /CH0131
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act - Notice Requirements and Limits on Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0114 /CH0132
Title
Maryland Tort Claims Act - Claim Requirement and Limit on Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0210 (SB0268)
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0283 (SB0319)
Title
Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses - Violation of Maryland Constitutional Right
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0461
Title
District Court - Civil Jurisdiction - Amount in Controversy
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0728
Title
Governmental Tort Claims - Excessive Force or Misuse of Force by Law Enforcement Officer
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0890
Title
State and Local Police Officers - Liability Insurance - Required
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0147
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act and Maryland Tort Claims Act - Repeal of Certain Notice Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0252
Title
Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0268 (HB0210)
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0319 (HB0283)
Title
Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses - Violation of Maryland Constitutional Right
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0041 Immunities - Associations, Organizations, and Charities - Liability of Agents and Volunteers Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0104 Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
Ways and Means
HB0113 /CH0131 Local Government Tort Claims Act - Notice Requirements and Limits on Liability Delegate Conaway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Judiciary
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0114 /CH0132 Maryland Tort Claims Act - Claim Requirement and Limit on Liability Delegate Conaway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132
Judiciary
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0210 (SB0268) Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0283 (SB0319) Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses - Violation of Maryland Constitutional Right Delegate Carter 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0461 District Court - Civil Jurisdiction - Amount in Controversy Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0728 Governmental Tort Claims - Excessive Force or Misuse of Force by Law Enforcement Officer Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0890 State and Local Police Officers - Liability Insurance - Required Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0147 Local Government Tort Claims Act and Maryland Tort Claims Act - Repeal of Certain Notice Requirements Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0252 Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0268 (HB0210) Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0319 (HB0283) Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses - Violation of Maryland Constitutional Right Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM