Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Torts -see also- Libel and Slander; Med Malp; Wrongful Death

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0219 /CH0046
Title
Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0601 /CH0673 (SB0248)
Title
Senior Call-Check Service and Notification Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0642 /CH0012 (SB0505/CH0656)
Title
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Required Findings
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0903 (SB0705)
Title
Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses - Violation of Maryland Constitutional Right
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1353
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act and Maryland Tort Claims Act - Damages Sustained on Artificial or Synthetic Turf Playing Fields
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1373 (SB0336)
Title
Maryland Tort Claims Act - Certain Claim Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0106 /CH0045
Title
Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0144
Title
Civil Actions - Prelitigation Discovery of Insurance Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0336 (HB1373)
Title
Maryland Tort Claims Act - Certain Claim Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0505 /CH0656 (HB0642/CH0012)
Title
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Required Findings
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0510
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Time for Filing
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0585
Title
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Required Findings
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0705 (HB0903)
Title
Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses - Violation of Maryland Constitutional Right
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0219 /CH0046 Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Judiciary
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0601 /CH0673 (SB0248) Senior Call-Check Service and Notification Program - Establishment Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 673
Economic Matters
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0642 /CH0012 (SB0505/CH0656) Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Required Findings Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0903 (SB0705) Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses - Violation of Maryland Constitutional Right Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1353 Local Government Tort Claims Act and Maryland Tort Claims Act - Damages Sustained on Artificial or Synthetic Turf Playing Fields Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1373 (SB0336) Maryland Tort Claims Act - Certain Claim Requirement Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
SB0106 /CH0045 Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0144 Civil Actions - Prelitigation Discovery of Insurance Coverage Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0336 (HB1373) Maryland Tort Claims Act - Certain Claim Requirement Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0505 /CH0656 (HB0642/CH0012) Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Required Findings Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 656
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0510 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Time for Filing Senator Norman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0585 Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Required Findings Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0705 (HB0903) Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses - Violation of Maryland Constitutional Right Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM