Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Towing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1269 (SB0917)
Title
Maryland Salvage Advertising Act
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0553 /CH0039
Title
Motor Clubs - Scope of Law - Fees
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0917 (HB1269)
Title
Maryland Salvage Advertising Act
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1269 (SB0917) Maryland Salvage Advertising Act Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0553 /CH0039 Motor Clubs - Scope of Law - Fees Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0917 (HB1269) Maryland Salvage Advertising Act Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM