Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Towing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0238 /CH0777
Title
Prince George’s County – Vehicle Laws – Authority to Tow Vehicles PG 418–18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0531 /CH0544 (SB0445/CH0545)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Operation When Approaching Vehicle With Visual Signals
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0598
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0903 /CH0780 (SB0847)
Title
Washington County - Highway Parking - Prohibition on Prolonged Parking of Inoperable or Disabled Vehicle
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1543
Title
Tow Trucks – Driver Safety Act
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1770 (SB0521)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Towing Companies - Disposal of Abandoned Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0445 /CH0545 (HB0531/CH0544)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Operation When Approaching Vehicle With Visual Signals
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0521 (HB1770)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Towing Companies - Disposal of Abandoned Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0847 (HB0903/CH0780)
Title
Washington County - Highway Parking - Prohibition on Prolonged Parking of Inoperable or Disabled Vehicle
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0238 /CH0777 Prince George’s County – Vehicle Laws – Authority to Tow Vehicles PG 418–18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 777
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0531 /CH0544 (SB0445/CH0545) Motor Vehicles - Operation When Approaching Vehicle With Visual Signals Delegate Healey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 544
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0598 Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0903 /CH0780 (SB0847) Washington County - Highway Parking - Prohibition on Prolonged Parking of Inoperable or Disabled Vehicle Delegate Parrott 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 780
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1543 Tow Trucks – Driver Safety Act Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1770 (SB0521) Vehicle Laws - Towing Companies - Disposal of Abandoned Vehicles Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0445 /CH0545 (HB0531/CH0544) Motor Vehicles - Operation When Approaching Vehicle With Visual Signals Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 545
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0521 (HB1770) Vehicle Laws - Towing Companies - Disposal of Abandoned Vehicles Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0847 (HB0903/CH0780) Washington County - Highway Parking - Prohibition on Prolonged Parking of Inoperable or Disabled Vehicle Washington County Senators 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:57 PM