Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Towing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0376
Title
Vehicle Laws - Traffic Accident or Incident Management (Clear the Road Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0393 /CH0470
Title
Natural Resources - Park Services Associates - Parking Citations
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0429
Title
Tow Trucks - Driver Safety Act
Sponsor
Environment and Transportation Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0943
Title
Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0010 /CH0081
Title
Natural Resources - Oysters, Clams, and Clamming - Licenses and Regulations
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0316
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0376 Vehicle Laws - Traffic Accident or Incident Management (Clear the Road Act of 2019) Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0393 /CH0470 Natural Resources - Park Services Associates - Parking Citations Delegate Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0429 Tow Trucks - Driver Safety Act Environment and Transportation Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0943 Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
SB0010 /CH0081 Natural Resources - Oysters, Clams, and Clamming - Licenses and Regulations Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2019 - 3:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0316 Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM