Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Trade Secrets

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0784 (SB0957)
Title
Consumer Protection - Online Privacy - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0799
Title
Consumer Protection - Right to Repair Farm Equipment
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1093
Title
Baltimore County Circuit Court - Criminal Proceedings Court Webcast - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1124 (SB0723)
Title
Consumer Protection - Right to Repair
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1466
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Contracts - Intellectual Property
Sponsor
Delegate Boteler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0723 (HB1124)
Title
Consumer Protection - Right to Repair
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0957 (HB0784)
Title
Maryland Online Consumer Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0784 (SB0957) Consumer Protection - Online Privacy - Study Delegate Carey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Economic Matters
3/09/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0799 Consumer Protection - Right to Repair Farm Equipment Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1093 Baltimore County Circuit Court - Criminal Proceedings Court Webcast - Pilot Program Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1124 (SB0723) Consumer Protection - Right to Repair Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1466 Labor and Employment - Employment Contracts - Intellectual Property Delegate Boteler 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0723 (HB1124) Consumer Protection - Right to Repair Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0957 (HB0784) Maryland Online Consumer Protection Act Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/17/2020 12:17 PM