Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Transient Merchants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0298
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Farmers' Markets
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0648
Title
Montgomery County - Winery Special Event Permits - Farmers' Markets MC 3-13
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0660 (SB0827)
Title
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0978 /CH0396
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Winery Off-Site Permit and Wine Festival Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1197 (SB0980)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Winery Special Event Permits - Farmers' Markets
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1409
Title
Howard County - Winery Special Events Permits - Farmers' Markets Ho. Co. 16-13
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Licenses
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0827 (HB0660)
Title
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0980 (HB1197)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Winery Special Event Permits - Farmers' Markets
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0298 Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Farmers' Markets Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0648 Montgomery County - Winery Special Event Permits - Farmers' Markets MC 3-13 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0660 (SB0827) Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013 Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0978 /CH0396 Alcoholic Beverages - Winery Off-Site Permit and Wine Festival Permit Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1197 (SB0980) Queen Anne's County - Winery Special Event Permits - Farmers' Markets Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1409 Howard County - Winery Special Events Permits - Farmers' Markets Ho. Co. 16-13 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
SB0737 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Licenses Calvert County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0827 (HB0660) Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013 Senator Garagiola 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0980 (HB1197) Queen Anne's County - Winery Special Event Permits - Farmers' Markets Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM