Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Transient Merchants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0052
Title
Local Government - Lemonade Stands - Prohibition on Regulation by Local Law
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1123 (SB0403)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Agricultural Stands
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0351
Title
Agriculture - Farmers Markets - Advertising, Labeling, and Enforcement (Farmers Market Integrity Act)
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0403 (HB1123)
Title
Labor and Employment – Maryland Wage and Hour Law – Agricultural Stands, Retail Farms, and Farmers’ Markets
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0052 Local Government - Lemonade Stands - Prohibition on Regulation by Local Law Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1123 (SB0403) Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Agricultural Stands Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0351 Agriculture - Farmers Markets - Advertising, Labeling, and Enforcement (Farmers Market Integrity Act) Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0403 (HB1123) Labor and Employment – Maryland Wage and Hour Law – Agricultural Stands, Retail Farms, and Farmers’ Markets Senator Carozza 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/10/2020 12:57 PM