Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Trees

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0572 /CH0620
Title
Natural Resources - Tree Expert License - Qualifications
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0587 /CH0122
Title
Electric Companies - Service Quality and Reliability Standards - Vegetation Management
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0623
Title
Environment - Sediment Control - Agricultural Land Management Practices
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0706 /CH0384
Title
Natural Resources - Forest Preservation Act of 2013
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0728 (SB0211)
Title
Natural Resources - Tree Experts - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0927 (SB0692)
Title
Licensed Tree Expert - License Renewal - Continuing Education Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0936 /CH0655
Title
Natural Resources - Maryland Botanical Heritage Workgroup
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1084 /CH0323 (SB0797/CH0322)
Title
Thermal Energy - Task Force and Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1102 (SB0684)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0073 /CH0018
Title
Vehicle Laws - Piling, Poles, Mill Logs, and Similar Cargo - Length, Overhang, and Fastening Standards
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0211 (HB0728)
Title
Natural Resources - Tree Experts - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0684 (HB1102)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0692 (HB0927)
Title
Licensed Tree Expert - License Renewal - Continuing Education Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0797 /CH0322 (HB1084/CH0323)
Title
Thermal Energy - Task Force and Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0572 /CH0620 Natural Resources - Tree Expert License - Qualifications Delegate Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 620
Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0587 /CH0122 Electric Companies - Service Quality and Reliability Standards - Vegetation Management Delegate Davis 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Economic Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0623 Environment - Sediment Control - Agricultural Land Management Practices Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0706 /CH0384 Natural Resources - Forest Preservation Act of 2013 Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0728 (SB0211) Natural Resources - Tree Experts - Prohibition Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0927 (SB0692) Licensed Tree Expert - License Renewal - Continuing Education Requirement Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0936 /CH0655 Natural Resources - Maryland Botanical Heritage Workgroup Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 655
Environmental Matters
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1084 /CH0323 (SB0797/CH0322) Thermal Energy - Task Force and Regulations Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Economic Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1102 (SB0684) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass Delegate Olszewski 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0073 /CH0018 Vehicle Laws - Piling, Poles, Mill Logs, and Similar Cargo - Length, Overhang, and Fastening Standards Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 18
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0211 (HB0728) Natural Resources - Tree Experts - Prohibition Senator Shank 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0684 (HB1102) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass Senator Garagiola 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0692 (HB0927) Licensed Tree Expert - License Renewal - Continuing Education Requirement Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0797 /CH0322 (HB1084/CH0323) Thermal Energy - Task Force and Regulations Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 322
Finance
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM