Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Trees

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0874 /CH0464
Title
Air Navigation Protection From Hazards Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1118
Title
Natural Resources - Roadside Trees - Preservation and Protection
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1133
Title
Washington County - State Highway Rights-of-Way - Tree Planting and Signs
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0874 /CH0464 Air Navigation Protection From Hazards Act of 2017 Delegate Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1118 Natural Resources - Roadside Trees - Preservation and Protection Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1133 Washington County - State Highway Rights-of-Way - Tree Planting and Signs Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:53 PM