Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Trespass

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0020
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Security - School Resource Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0073 /CH0049 (SB0247/CH0048)
Title
Civil Actions - Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog - Rebuttable Presumption
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0080
Title
Civil Actions - Liability for Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0214
Title
Criminal Law - Self-Defense - Immunity for Use of Physical Force in Defense of Dwelling
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1185
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Right to Defend Property
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0247 /CH0048 (HB0073/CH0049)
Title
Civil Actions - Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog - Rebuttable Presumption
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0020 Primary and Secondary Education - Security - School Resource Officers Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0073 /CH0049 (SB0247/CH0048) Civil Actions - Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog - Rebuttable Presumption Delegate Simmons 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Judiciary
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0080 Civil Actions - Liability for Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0214 Criminal Law - Self-Defense - Immunity for Use of Physical Force in Defense of Dwelling Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1185 Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Right to Defend Property Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0247 /CH0048 (HB0073/CH0049) Civil Actions - Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog - Rebuttable Presumption Senator Frosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM