Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Trials

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0152
Title
Criminal Procedure - Successive Federal and State Prosecutions - Bar
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0180 /CH0062 (SB0580/CH0061)
Title
Medical Marijuana - Caregiver - Affirmative Defense
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0336 (SB0009)
Title
Criminal Law - Table Games and Video Lottery Terminals - Playing by Individual Under 21 Years of Age
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0382
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund - Court Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0652 (SB0817)
Title
Criminal Law - Informants - Identity of Minors
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0821
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to Privilege
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0909 /CH0650 (SB0872)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Venue for Prosecution of Murder and Manslaughter
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0968
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Commencement of Actions to Repossess
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1037 (SB0630)
Title
Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective Order
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1112 (SB0556)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Persons Committed as Not Criminally Responsible - Release
Sponsor
Delegate Mitchell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1211 /CH0486 (SB0489/CH0485)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Schulz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1251
Title
Public Safety - Firearms - Firearms Sales Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1499 /CH0419 (SB1039)
Title
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0009 (HB0336)
Title
Criminal Law - Table Games and Video Lottery Terminals - Playing by Individual Under 21 Years of Age
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0043
Title
Courts - Evidence - Vehicle Repair Estimates
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0556 (HB1112)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Persons Committed as Not Criminally Responsible - Release
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0580 /CH0061 (HB0180/CH0062)
Title
Medical Marijuana - Caregiver - Affirmative Defense
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0626
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund - Court Costs
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0630 (HB1037)
Title
Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective Order
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0817 (HB0652)
Title
Criminal Law - Informants - Identity of Minors
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0872 (HB0909/CH0650)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Venue for Prosecution of Murder and Manslaughter
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1039 (HB1499/CH0419)
Title
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0152 Criminal Procedure - Successive Federal and State Prosecutions - Bar Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Failed (46-89)
Judiciary
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0180 /CH0062 (SB0580/CH0061) Medical Marijuana - Caregiver - Affirmative Defense Delegate Glenn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Judiciary
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0336 (SB0009) Criminal Law - Table Games and Video Lottery Terminals - Playing by Individual Under 21 Years of Age Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0382 Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund - Court Costs Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0652 (SB0817) Criminal Law - Informants - Identity of Minors Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0821 Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to Privilege Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0909 /CH0650 (SB0872) Criminal Procedure - Venue for Prosecution of Murder and Manslaughter Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 650
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0968 Landlord and Tenant - Commencement of Actions to Repossess Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1037 (SB0630) Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective Order Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1112 (SB0556) Criminal Procedure - Persons Committed as Not Criminally Responsible - Release Delegate Mitchell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1211 /CH0486 (SB0489/CH0485) Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law) Delegate Schulz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 486
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1251 Public Safety - Firearms - Firearms Sales Prohibition Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1499 /CH0419 (SB1039) Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013 Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0009 (HB0336) Criminal Law - Table Games and Video Lottery Terminals - Playing by Individual Under 21 Years of Age Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 PM
SB0043 Courts - Evidence - Vehicle Repair Estimates Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2013 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0556 (HB1112) Criminal Procedure - Persons Committed as Not Criminally Responsible - Release Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0580 /CH0061 (HB0180/CH0062) Medical Marijuana - Caregiver - Affirmative Defense Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0626 Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund - Court Costs Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0630 (HB1037) Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective Order Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0817 (HB0652) Criminal Law - Informants - Identity of Minors Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0872 (HB0909/CH0650) Criminal Procedure - Venue for Prosecution of Murder and Manslaughter Senator Jacobs 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1039 (HB1499/CH0419) Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013 President 6 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM