Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Trials

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0105
Title
Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia and Marijuana - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0120 /CH0402
Title
Criminal Procedure - Failure to Appear - Rescheduling
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0132 (SB0306)
Title
Criminal Law - Reckless Endangerment - Repeal of Specific Charging Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0457
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0489 /CH0425 (SB0007)
Title
Electronic Cigarettes - Sale to Minors - Components, Supplies, and Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0495
Title
Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia Possession of Less Than 10 Grams of Marijuana - Code Violation
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0816
Title
Courts - Evidence - Membership in or Association With a Criminal Gang
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0833 (SB0558)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship With Dealers
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0961 (SB0511)
Title
Women's Late-Term Pregnancy Health Act
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1117
Title
Criminal Procedure - Statewide DNA Data Base System - Admissibility of DNA Match Evidence
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1191
Title
Criminal Law - Sexual Offenses - Evidence of Defendant's Past Conduct
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1205
Title
Criminal Law - Sexual Offenses - Evidence of Defendant's Past Conduct
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0007 (HB0489/CH0425)
Title
Electronic Cigarettes - Sale to Minors - Components, Supplies, and Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0306 (HB0132)
Title
Criminal Law - Reckless Endangerment - Repeal of Specific Charging Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0474
Title
Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0475
Title
Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0511 (HB0961)
Title
Women's Late-Term Pregnancy Health Act
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0520 /CH0357
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0558 (HB0833)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship With Dealers
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0755 /CH0380
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Central Committee Candidates
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0790
Title
Vehicle Laws - Right-of-Way Violations - Death or Serious Bodily Injury - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0105 Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia and Marijuana - Penalties Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-3)
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0120 /CH0402 Criminal Procedure - Failure to Appear - Rescheduling Delegate Vallario 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 402
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0132 (SB0306) Criminal Law - Reckless Endangerment - Repeal of Specific Charging Requirement Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0457 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0489 /CH0425 (SB0007) Electronic Cigarettes - Sale to Minors - Components, Supplies, and Enforcement Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Finance
HB0495 Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia Possession of Less Than 10 Grams of Marijuana - Code Violation Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0816 Courts - Evidence - Membership in or Association With a Criminal Gang Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0833 (SB0558) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship With Dealers Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0961 (SB0511) Women's Late-Term Pregnancy Health Act Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1117 Criminal Procedure - Statewide DNA Data Base System - Admissibility of DNA Match Evidence Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1191 Criminal Law - Sexual Offenses - Evidence of Defendant's Past Conduct Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1205 Criminal Law - Sexual Offenses - Evidence of Defendant's Past Conduct Delegate Anderson 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0007 (HB0489/CH0425) Electronic Cigarettes - Sale to Minors - Components, Supplies, and Enforcement Senator Middleton 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
1/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Judiciary
SB0306 (HB0132) Criminal Law - Reckless Endangerment - Repeal of Specific Charging Requirement Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0474 Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0475 Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0511 (HB0961) Women's Late-Term Pregnancy Health Act Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0520 /CH0357 Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0558 (HB0833) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship With Dealers Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0755 /CH0380 Election Law - Campaign Finance - Central Committee Candidates Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0790 Vehicle Laws - Right-of-Way Violations - Death or Serious Bodily Injury - Penalties Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM