Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Trucks

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0886
Title
Motor Vehicles - Stopping on Shoulder - Warning Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1255
Title
Motor Vehicles - Towing Services - Licensing
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0064 /CH0015
Title
Controlled Hazardous Substance Vehicles - Display of Certificates
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0072 /CH0176
Title
Motor Vehicles - Damage to Highways from Overweight or Oversized Vehicles - Liability and Penalties
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0073 /CH0018
Title
Vehicle Laws - Piling, Poles, Mill Logs, and Similar Cargo - Length, Overhang, and Fastening Standards
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0378
Title
Vehicle Laws - Operation of Vehicle on Approach of Tow Truck
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0886 Motor Vehicles - Stopping on Shoulder - Warning Devices Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1255 Motor Vehicles - Towing Services - Licensing Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0064 /CH0015 Controlled Hazardous Substance Vehicles - Display of Certificates Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 15
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0072 /CH0176 Motor Vehicles - Damage to Highways from Overweight or Oversized Vehicles - Liability and Penalties Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0073 /CH0018 Vehicle Laws - Piling, Poles, Mill Logs, and Similar Cargo - Length, Overhang, and Fastening Standards Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 18
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0378 Vehicle Laws - Operation of Vehicle on Approach of Tow Truck Senator Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM
Click to return on the top page