Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Trucks

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0233 /CH0080
Title
Motor Vehicles - Calculation of Length - Loading Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0700 (SB0436)
Title
Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Prior Approval Rate Making - Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0747
Title
Thomas J. Hatem Memorial Bridge - Multiple Axle Vehicles - Toll Rates
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0846 /CH0283 (SB0671)
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Commercial Driver's License - Program for Veterans and Service Members (Troops to Trucks)
Sponsor
Delegate Vogt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1229 /CH0304
Title
Commercial Motor Vehicles - Denial, Cancellation, Suspension, or Revocation of Registration
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1253 (SB0910/CH0208)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Entry-Level Commercial Truck Driver's License Holders - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0436 (HB0700)
Title
Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Prior Approval Rate Making - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0671 (HB0846/CH0283)
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Commercial Driver's License - Program for Veterans and Service Members (Troops to Trucks)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0910 /CH0208 (HB1253)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Entry-Level Commercial Truck Driver's License Holders - Study
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0233 /CH0080 Motor Vehicles - Calculation of Length - Loading Devices Delegate Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0700 (SB0436) Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Prior Approval Rate Making - Exemptions Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0747 Thomas J. Hatem Memorial Bridge - Multiple Axle Vehicles - Toll Rates Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0846 /CH0283 (SB0671) Motor Vehicle Administration - Commercial Driver's License - Program for Veterans and Service Members (Troops to Trucks) Delegate Vogt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1229 /CH0304 Commercial Motor Vehicles - Denial, Cancellation, Suspension, or Revocation of Registration Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1253 (SB0910/CH0208) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Entry-Level Commercial Truck Driver's License Holders - Study Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0436 (HB0700) Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Prior Approval Rate Making - Exemptions Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0671 (HB0846/CH0283) Motor Vehicle Administration - Commercial Driver's License - Program for Veterans and Service Members (Troops to Trucks) Senator Young 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0910 /CH0208 (HB1253) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Entry-Level Commercial Truck Driver's License Holders - Study Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 208
Finance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM