Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Tuition

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0471
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Tuition Rates - Veterans
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0526 /CH0374
Title
Higher Education - Maryland First Scholarship - Creation and Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Summers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0739
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Legal Presence and Tuition Rates - Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0740 (SB0705)
Title
Graduate Level Education - Exemption from Paying Nonresident Tuition - Members of the United States Armed Forces
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0754
Title
Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Qualified Offer
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0831 /CH0564 (SB0828/CH0563)
Title
St. Mary's College of Maryland - Tuition Freeze and DeSousa-Brent Scholars Completion Grant
Sponsor
Delegate Bohanan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0833 (SB0740/CH0533)
Title
College Readiness and Completion Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0862
Title
Higher Education - In-State Tuition - Reduction for Educators
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0871
Title
Education - Dually Enrolled Students - In-State and In-County Tuition
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0928
Title
Community Colleges - Dually Enrolled Students - Tuition Waiver
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0935 /CH0654
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - In-State Tuition for Military Veterans
Sponsor
Delegate Stifler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0963 /CH0395
Title
Edward T. Conroy and Jean B. Cryor Memorial Scholarship Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1012 /CH0260 (SB0414/CH0259)
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Waiver - Foster Care Recipients
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1013 (SB0543)
Title
Foster Care Recipients - Waiver of Tuition and Other Charges
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1033
Title
Education - Taxpayers' Savings Act
Sponsor
Delegate Stocksdale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1288
Title
Accountability in Education Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Stocksdale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0414 /CH0259 (HB1012/CH0260)
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Waiver - Foster Care Recipients
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0543 (HB1013)
Title
Foster Care Recipients - Waiver of Tuition and Other Charges
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0587 /CH0503
Title
Higher Education - Charles W. Riley Firefighter and Ambulance and Rescue Squad Member Scholarship
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0705 (HB0740)
Title
Graduate Level Education - Exemption from Paying Nonresident Tuition - Members of the United States Armed Forces
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0740 /CH0533 (HB0833)
Title
College and Career Readiness and College Completion Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0812
Title
Tuition Cap and College Opportunity Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0828 /CH0563 (HB0831/CH0564)
Title
St. Mary's College of Maryland - Tuition Freeze and DeSousa-Brent Scholars Completion Grant
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0471 Public Institutions of Higher Education - Tuition Rates - Veterans Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0526 /CH0374 Higher Education - Maryland First Scholarship - Creation and Funding Delegate Summers 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0739 Public Institutions of Higher Education - Legal Presence and Tuition Rates - Reporting Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0740 (SB0705) Graduate Level Education - Exemption from Paying Nonresident Tuition - Members of the United States Armed Forces Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0754 Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Qualified Offer Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0831 /CH0564 (SB0828/CH0563) St. Mary's College of Maryland - Tuition Freeze and DeSousa-Brent Scholars Completion Grant Delegate Bohanan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 564
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0833 (SB0740/CH0533) College Readiness and Completion Act of 2013 Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0862 Higher Education - In-State Tuition - Reduction for Educators Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0871 Education - Dually Enrolled Students - In-State and In-County Tuition Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0928 Community Colleges - Dually Enrolled Students - Tuition Waiver Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0935 /CH0654 Public Institutions of Higher Education - In-State Tuition for Military Veterans Delegate Stifler 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0963 /CH0395 Edward T. Conroy and Jean B. Cryor Memorial Scholarship Programs Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1012 /CH0260 (SB0414/CH0259) Higher Education - Tuition Waiver - Foster Care Recipients Delegate Wilson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1013 (SB0543) Foster Care Recipients - Waiver of Tuition and Other Charges Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1033 Education - Taxpayers' Savings Act Delegate Stocksdale 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1288 Accountability in Education Act of 2013 Delegate Stocksdale 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0414 /CH0259 (HB1012/CH0260) Higher Education - Tuition Waiver - Foster Care Recipients Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0543 (HB1013) Foster Care Recipients - Waiver of Tuition and Other Charges Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0587 /CH0503 Higher Education - Charles W. Riley Firefighter and Ambulance and Rescue Squad Member Scholarship Senator Garagiola 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0705 (HB0740) Graduate Level Education - Exemption from Paying Nonresident Tuition - Members of the United States Armed Forces Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0740 /CH0533 (HB0833) College and Career Readiness and College Completion Act of 2013 Senator Pinsky 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0812 Tuition Cap and College Opportunity Act of 2013 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2013 - 1:15 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0828 /CH0563 (HB0831/CH0564) St. Mary's College of Maryland - Tuition Freeze and DeSousa-Brent Scholars Completion Grant Senator Madaleno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM