Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Unemployment

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0281
Title
Determination of Unemployment Insurance Benefits - Voluntarily Leaving Work - Valid Circumstances
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0283
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Appeal of Benefit Determination - Discovery of Financial Crime
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0348 /CH0098
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Employer Contributions - Application for Refund or Adjustment
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0354 /CH0103
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Monetary Penalty for Fraud
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0583 /CH0121
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Relief from Charges for Overpayment of Benefits - Restrictions
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0689
Title
Income Tax Credit - Unemployed Veterans - Start-Up Business
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0884 (SB0686/CH0526)
Title
Family Investment Program - Earned Income Disregard Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0955 /CH0394 (SB0888)
Title
Task Force to Study Temporary Disability Insurance Programs and the Process for Assisting Individuals with Disabilities at Local Departments of Social Services
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1019 /CH0293 (SB0586/CH0292)
Title
Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Hub and Spoke Program in the Southern Maryland Region
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1513 /CH0420 (SB1037)
Title
Public Safety - Response to a State Disaster or Emergency - Licensing and Taxes
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0051
Title
Employment Contracts - Noncompetition Covenant - Conditions Affecting Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0586 /CH0292 (HB1019/CH0293)
Title
Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Hub and Spoke Program in the Southern Maryland Region
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0686 /CH0526 (HB0884)
Title
Family Investment Program - Earned Income Disregard Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0888 (HB0955/CH0394)
Title
Task Force to Study Temporary Disability Insurance Programs and the Process for Assisting Individuals with Disabilities at Local Departments of Social Services
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1037 (HB1513/CH0420)
Title
Public Safety - Response to a State Disaster or Emergency - Licensing and Taxes
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0281 Determination of Unemployment Insurance Benefits - Voluntarily Leaving Work - Valid Circumstances Delegate Hough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0283 Unemployment Insurance - Appeal of Benefit Determination - Discovery of Financial Crime Delegate Hough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0348 /CH0098 Unemployment Insurance - Employer Contributions - Application for Refund or Adjustment Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Economic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0354 /CH0103 Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Monetary Penalty for Fraud Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Economic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0583 /CH0121 Unemployment Insurance - Relief from Charges for Overpayment of Benefits - Restrictions Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Economic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0689 Income Tax Credit - Unemployed Veterans - Start-Up Business Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0884 (SB0686/CH0526) Family Investment Program - Earned Income Disregard Pilot Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0955 /CH0394 (SB0888) Task Force to Study Temporary Disability Insurance Programs and the Process for Assisting Individuals with Disabilities at Local Departments of Social Services Delegate Jameson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Economic Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1019 /CH0293 (SB0586/CH0292) Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Hub and Spoke Program in the Southern Maryland Region Delegate Jameson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293
Environmental Matters
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1513 /CH0420 (SB1037) Public Safety - Response to a State Disaster or Emergency - Licensing and Taxes Delegate Hixson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0051 Employment Contracts - Noncompetition Covenant - Conditions Affecting Enforcement Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
1/24/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0586 /CH0292 (HB1019/CH0293) Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Hub and Spoke Program in the Southern Maryland Region Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0686 /CH0526 (HB0884) Family Investment Program - Earned Income Disregard Pilot Program Senator Garagiola 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526
Finance
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0888 (HB0955/CH0394) Task Force to Study Temporary Disability Insurance Programs and the Process for Assisting Individuals with Disabilities at Local Departments of Social Services Senator Garagiola 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1037 (HB1513/CH0420) Public Safety - Response to a State Disaster or Emergency - Licensing and Taxes Senator King 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM