Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Unemployment

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0363 (SB0305)
Title
More Jobs for Marylanders Act 2.0
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0580 (SB0250)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Prohibited Lease Provisions - Late Fees for Tenants Receiving Government Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0939
Title
Regional Carbon Cost Collection Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0941 /CH0396
Title
Child Care Subsidy Program – Unemployment – Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1295 /CH0584 (SB0989/CH0583)
Title
One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Simplification and Alteration
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1500 /CH0534 (SB0979/CH0535)
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Third–Party Actions – Subsequent Injury Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1554 /CH0406
Title
Child Support - Payment Incentive Program Expansion Act of 2018
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1594 (SB1104)
Title
Economic Development - More Jobs for Marylanders - Tier I Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1615 /CH0408 (SB1231)
Title
Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance Program
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0305 (HB0363)
Title
More Jobs for Marylanders Act 2.0
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0444 /CH0708
Title
Task Force on the Social Determinants of Health in Baltimore City
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0975
Title
Task Force to Study Drug Addiction as a Chronic Disease
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0989 /CH0583 (HB1295/CH0584)
Title
One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Simplification and Alteration
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1104 (HB1594)
Title
Economic Development - More Jobs for Marylanders - Tier I Eligibility
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1231 (HB1615/CH0408)
Title
Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance Program
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0363 (SB0305) More Jobs for Marylanders Act 2.0 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0580 (SB0250) Landlord and Tenant - Prohibited Lease Provisions - Late Fees for Tenants Receiving Government Benefits Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0939 Regional Carbon Cost Collection Initiative Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB0941 /CH0396 Child Care Subsidy Program – Unemployment – Eligibility Delegate Queen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1295 /CH0584 (SB0989/CH0583) One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Simplification and Alteration Delegate Buckel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 584
Ways and Means
3/09/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1500 /CH0534 (SB0979/CH0535) Workers’ Compensation – Third–Party Actions – Subsequent Injury Fund Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534
Economic Matters
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1554 /CH0406 Child Support - Payment Incentive Program Expansion Act of 2018 Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
Judiciary
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1594 (SB1104) Economic Development - More Jobs for Marylanders - Tier I Eligibility Delegate Carey 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Ways and Means
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1615 /CH0408 (SB1231) Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance Program Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408
Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0305 (HB0363) More Jobs for Marylanders Act 2.0 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0444 /CH0708 Task Force on the Social Determinants of Health in Baltimore City Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 708
Finance
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0975 Task Force to Study Drug Addiction as a Chronic Disease Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0989 /CH0583 (HB1295/CH0584) One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Simplification and Alteration Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2018 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1104 (HB1594) Economic Development - More Jobs for Marylanders - Tier I Eligibility Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Klausmeier)
Finance
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1231 (HB1615/CH0408) Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance Program Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:58 PM