Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Unfair Trade Practices

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0313 /CH0157 (SB0298/CH0156)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Financing or Leasing Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0403
Title
Business Regulation - Sales of Dogs and Cats - Required Health Certificate
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0416
Title
Consumer Protection - Required Disclosure of Social Security Number - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0504
Title
Telephone Communications Consumer Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0568 (SB0587)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Motor Vehicle Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0744 /CH0453
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - "Mug Shot" Web Sites
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1012
Title
Homeowner's Insurance and Renter's Insurance - Adjustment and Settlement Practices
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1094
Title
Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1255 (SB0936)
Title
Maryland Locksmith Act - Public Lists of Licensees - Remedies for Violations
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0298 /CH0156 (HB0313/CH0157)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Financing or Leasing Agreements
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0587 (HB0568)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Motor Vehicle Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0936 (HB1255)
Title
Maryland Locksmith Act - Public Lists of Licensees - Remedies for Violations
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0313 /CH0157 (SB0298/CH0156) Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Financing or Leasing Agreements Delegate Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0403 Business Regulation - Sales of Dogs and Cats - Required Health Certificate Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0416 Consumer Protection - Required Disclosure of Social Security Number - Prohibition Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0504 Telephone Communications Consumer Protection Act Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0568 (SB0587) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Motor Vehicle Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0744 /CH0453 Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - "Mug Shot" Web Sites Delegate Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
Economic Matters
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1012 Homeowner's Insurance and Renter's Insurance - Adjustment and Settlement Practices Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1094 Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required Notice Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Economic Matters
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1255 (SB0936) Maryland Locksmith Act - Public Lists of Licensees - Remedies for Violations Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0298 /CH0156 (HB0313/CH0157) Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Financing or Leasing Agreements Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0587 (HB0568) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Motor Vehicle Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0936 (HB1255) Maryland Locksmith Act - Public Lists of Licensees - Remedies for Violations Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM