Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Unfair Trade Practices

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0674 (SB0168)
Title
Maryland Paint Stewardship Program
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1114 (SB0892)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1120 /CH0560 (SB1004)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Performance Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1173
Title
Real Property - Rent-to-Own Agreements and Contracts - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1494 (SB0459/CH0807)
Title
Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Form and Confessed Judgment Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1499
Title
Consumer Protection - Bank Overdraft Plans - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1617
Title
State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - State Institutions of Higher Education
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0168 (HB0674)
Title
Maryland Paint Stewardship Program
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0459 /CH0807 (HB1494)
Title
Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Form and Confessed Judgment Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0566
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0892 (HB1114)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1004 (HB1120/CH0560)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Performance Standards
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1200
Title
Internet Consumer Privacy Rights Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0674 (SB0168) Maryland Paint Stewardship Program Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1114 (SB0892) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1120 /CH0560 (SB1004) Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Performance Standards Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 560
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1173 Real Property - Rent-to-Own Agreements and Contracts - Requirements Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1494 (SB0459/CH0807) Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Form and Confessed Judgment Prohibition Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Rules
HB1499 Consumer Protection - Bank Overdraft Plans - Requirements Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1617 State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - State Institutions of Higher Education Delegate Jackson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0168 (HB0674) Maryland Paint Stewardship Program Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0459 /CH0807 (HB1494) Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Form and Confessed Judgment Prohibition Senator Feldman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 807
Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0566 Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0892 (HB1114) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1004 (HB1120/CH0560) Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Performance Standards Senator Hough 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1200 Internet Consumer Privacy Rights Act of 2017 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Referred Economic Matters
Finance
4/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:53 PM