Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Unions

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0030
Title
Frederick County Public Charter School Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Schulz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0041
Title
Immunities - Associations, Organizations, and Charities - Liability of Agents and Volunteers
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104
Title
Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0158 /CH0403 (SB0243)
Title
State Personnel and Procurement - Service Contracts - Reporting and Audit Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0219
Title
Independent Expenditures and Electioneering Communications - Registration and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0249
Title
Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0486 (SB0595/CH0311)
Title
Public Charter School Expansion and Improvement Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0895 (SB0466/CH0352)
Title
Baltimore County - Education - Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps Instructors
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0966
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0993 (SB0752)
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0243 (HB0158/CH0403)
Title
State Personnel and Procurement - Service Contracts - Reporting and Audit Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0466 /CH0352 (HB0895)
Title
Baltimore County - Education - Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps Instructors
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0595 /CH0311 (HB0486)
Title
Public Charter School Improvement Act of 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0683
Title
State Board of Education - Next Generation Schools - Established
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0752 (HB0993)
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0030 Frederick County Public Charter School Program - Establishment Delegate Schulz 2 2 In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Ways and Means
HB0041 Immunities - Associations, Organizations, and Charities - Liability of Agents and Volunteers Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0104 Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
Ways and Means
HB0158 /CH0403 (SB0243) State Personnel and Procurement - Service Contracts - Reporting and Audit Requirements Delegate Haynes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Appropriations
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0219 Independent Expenditures and Electioneering Communications - Registration and Reporting Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0249 Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0486 (SB0595/CH0311) Public Charter School Expansion and Improvement Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0895 (SB0466/CH0352) Baltimore County - Education - Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps Instructors Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0966 Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0993 (SB0752) Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
SB0243 (HB0158/CH0403) State Personnel and Procurement - Service Contracts - Reporting and Audit Requirements Senator Feldman 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0466 /CH0352 (HB0895) Baltimore County - Education - Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps Instructors Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0595 /CH0311 (HB0486) Public Charter School Improvement Act of 2015 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
4/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0683 State Board of Education - Next Generation Schools - Established Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0752 (HB0993) Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM