Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Unions

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0239 (SB0291/CH0015)
Title
Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0507
Title
Community Colleges and Local Governments - Unfair Labor Practices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0531
Title
Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0605 /CH0141 (SB0204/CH0142)
Title
PenMar Development Corporation - Dissolution - Authority of Washington County Over Fort Ritchie
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0670
Title
Harford County - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0871 (SB0652)
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1370
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Rights for Local Government Employees - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1431
Title
Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0204 /CH0142 (HB0605/CH0141)
Title
PenMar Development Corporation - Dissolution - Authority of Washington County Over Fort Ritchie
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0291 /CH0015 (HB0239)
Title
Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0490
Title
Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work Act
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0652 (HB0871)
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0239 (SB0291/CH0015) Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0507 Community Colleges and Local Governments - Unfair Labor Practices - Prohibition Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0531 Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0605 /CH0141 (SB0204/CH0142) PenMar Development Corporation - Dissolution - Authority of Washington County Over Fort Ritchie Washington County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Economic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0670 Harford County - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0871 (SB0652) Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1370 Labor and Employment - Employment Rights for Local Government Employees - Establishment Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1431 Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (36-0)
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0204 /CH0142 (HB0605/CH0141) PenMar Development Corporation - Dissolution - Authority of Washington County Over Fort Ritchie Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Finance
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0291 /CH0015 (HB0239) Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 15
Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0490 Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work Act Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0652 (HB0871) Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:53 PM