Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Unions

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0163
Title
Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0872 /CH0353 (SB0467/CH0354)
Title
State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1149 (SB1013)
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Social Housing Subprogram (Social Housing Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1236
Title
Transit - Maryland Area Regional Commuter Train - Expansion of Service
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1300 (SB1000)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1545 (SB0887)
Title
Electric Generation - Transition From Fossil Fuels - Carbon Dioxide Emissions Rate and Transition Account
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0467 /CH0354 (HB0872/CH0353)
Title
State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0868
Title
Apprenticeship Maryland 2030
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0887 (HB1545)
Title
Electric Generation - Transition From Fossil Fuels - Carbon Dioxide Emissions Rate and Transition Account
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1000 (HB1300)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1013 (HB1149)
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Social Housing Subprogram (Social Housing Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0163 Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work Delegate Miller 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0872 /CH0353 (SB0467/CH0354) State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services - Membership Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 353
Judiciary
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1149 (SB1013) Department of Housing and Community Development - Social Housing Subprogram (Social Housing Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1236 Transit - Maryland Area Regional Commuter Train - Expansion of Service Delegate Solomon 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1300 (SB1000) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation Speaker 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB1545 (SB0887) Electric Generation - Transition From Fossil Fuels - Carbon Dioxide Emissions Rate and Transition Account Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0467 /CH0354 (HB0872/CH0353) State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services - Membership Senator Lee 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 354
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0868 Apprenticeship Maryland 2030 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0887 (HB1545) Electric Generation - Transition From Fossil Fuels - Carbon Dioxide Emissions Rate and Transition Account Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1000 (HB1300) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB1013 (HB1149) Department of Housing and Community Development - Social Housing Subprogram (Social Housing Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 1:50 PM