Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Urban Renewal -see also- Commercial Rehabilitation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0439
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Coppin Heights Urban Revitalization Project
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0470 (SB0243)
Title
Baltimore City - Park Heights Redevelopment Area - Alcoholic Beverages - Store Closing Time
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1286 /CH0839 (SB0614/CH0840)
Title
State Center - Redevelopment - Requirements, Participation, and Process
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1548 /CH0639 (SB1084/CH0640)
Title
Baltimore City - Continuing the Creating Opportunities for Renewal and Enterprise (CORE) Partnership Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0243 (HB0470)
Title
Baltimore City – Park Heights Redevelopment Area – Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0614 /CH0840 (HB1286/CH0839)
Title
State Center - Redevelopment - Requirements, Participation, and Process
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0918
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Federal Hill Streetscape Improvements
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0966
Title
RISE Zones - Expansion and Income Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1084 /CH0640 (HB1548/CH0639)
Title
Baltimore City - Continuing the Creating Opportunities for Renewal and Enterprise (CORE) Partnership Fund
Sponsor
Senator Conway
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0439 Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Coppin Heights Urban Revitalization Project Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 3:00 PM
HB0470 (SB0243) Baltimore City - Park Heights Redevelopment Area - Alcoholic Beverages - Store Closing Time Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1286 /CH0839 (SB0614/CH0840) State Center - Redevelopment - Requirements, Participation, and Process Delegate Glenn 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 839
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1548 /CH0639 (SB1084/CH0640) Baltimore City - Continuing the Creating Opportunities for Renewal and Enterprise (CORE) Partnership Fund Delegate Anderson 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0243 (HB0470) Baltimore City – Park Heights Redevelopment Area – Alcoholic Beverages Senator Robinson 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0614 /CH0840 (HB1286/CH0839) State Center - Redevelopment - Requirements, Participation, and Process Senator Robinson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 840
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0918 Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Federal Hill Streetscape Improvements Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2018 - 9:00 AM
SB0966 RISE Zones - Expansion and Income Tax Credit Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2018 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1084 /CH0640 (HB1548/CH0639) Baltimore City - Continuing the Creating Opportunities for Renewal and Enterprise (CORE) Partnership Fund Senator Conway 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 640
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:58 PM