Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vandalism

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0030
Title
Family Law – Domestic Violence – Definition of Abuse
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1695
Title
Crimes – Hate Crimes – Defacement
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0094 /CH0670
Title
Natural Resources – Unprotected Birds and Mammals
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0030 Family Law – Domestic Violence – Definition of Abuse Delegate Angel 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1695 Crimes – Hate Crimes – Defacement Delegate Chang 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Judiciary
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0094 /CH0670 Natural Resources – Unprotected Birds and Mammals Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 670
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:58 PM