Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vending Machines

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0085
Title
Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Requirements and Records
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0278
Title
Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum Age
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0338
Title
Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Licensing of Operators and Required Records
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0347 (SB0365)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0918 (SB0382/CH0161)
Title
Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Licensing of Buyers and Required Records
Sponsor
Delegate Costa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1273 (SB0986)
Title
Criminal Law - Energy Drinks - Sale to and Possession by Minors Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0325
Title
Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum Age
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0365 (HB0347)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0382 /CH0161 (HB0918)
Title
Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Licensing of Buyers and Required Records
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0394
Title
Statewide Container Recycling Refund Program
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0986 (HB1273)
Title
Criminal Law - Energy Drinks - Sale to and Possession by Minors Prohibited
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0085 Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Requirements and Records Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0278 Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum Age Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0338 Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Licensing of Operators and Required Records Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0347 (SB0365) Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0918 (SB0382/CH0161) Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Licensing of Buyers and Required Records Delegate Costa 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1273 (SB0986) Criminal Law - Energy Drinks - Sale to and Possession by Minors Prohibited Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0325 Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum Age Senator Forehand 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0365 (HB0347) Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction Senator Getty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0382 /CH0161 (HB0918) Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Licensing of Buyers and Required Records Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0394 Statewide Container Recycling Refund Program Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0986 (HB1273) Criminal Law - Energy Drinks - Sale to and Possession by Minors Prohibited Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM