Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vending Machines

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0272
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1111 (SB0969)
Title
Public Health - Access to Emergency Contraception - Student Health Centers and Vending Machines
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0457
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0969 (HB1111)
Title
Public Health - Access to Emergency Contraception - Student Health Centers and Vending Machines
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0272 Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB1111 (SB0969) Public Health - Access to Emergency Contraception - Student Health Centers and Vending Machines Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0457 Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0969 (HB1111) Public Health - Access to Emergency Contraception - Student Health Centers and Vending Machines Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:58 PM