Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Veterans Affairs, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1343 (SB0969)
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs - Opioids Time Lock Dispenser Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1433 (SB0052)
Title
Task Force to Study Services and Resources Provided by the Department of Veterans Affairs
Sponsor
Delegate Swain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0052 (HB1433)
Title
Task Force to Study Services and Resources Provided by the Department of Veterans Affairs
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0969 (HB1343)
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs - Opioid Time Lock Dispenser Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1343 (SB0969) Department of Veterans Affairs - Opioids Time Lock Dispenser Pilot Program Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1433 (SB0052) Task Force to Study Services and Resources Provided by the Department of Veterans Affairs Delegate Swain 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0052 (HB1433) Task Force to Study Services and Resources Provided by the Department of Veterans Affairs Senator Benson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0969 (HB1343) Department of Veterans Affairs - Opioid Time Lock Dispenser Pilot Program Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM