Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Veterans Affairs, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0242 /CH0153 (SB0053/CH0152)
Title
Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program Fund - Alteration of Program
Sponsor
Delegate Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0317 (SB0260)
Title
State Lottery – Instant Ticket Lottery Machines – Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1096 /CH0786
Title
State Government - Veteran Employment and Transition Success Program
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1214
Title
Public Safety - Trauma-Affected Veterans Training Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1542 /CH0795
Title
Department of Commerce – Employment in the State’s Defense Industry – Study
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1760 (SB1165/CH0740)
Title
Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprise Participation
Sponsor
Delegate Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0053 /CH0152 (HB0242/CH0153)
Title
Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program Fund - Alteration of Program
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0260 (HB0317)
Title
State Lottery – Instant Ticket Lottery Machines – Fraternal Organizations (“Slots” for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0911
Title
Veteran Suicide Prevention - Comprehensive Action Plan
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1118
Title
Public Safety - Trauma-Affected Veterans Training Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1165 /CH0740 (HB1760)
Title
Procurement – Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprise Participation
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0242 /CH0153 (SB0053/CH0152) Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program Fund - Alteration of Program Delegate Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0317 (SB0260) State Lottery – Instant Ticket Lottery Machines – Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act) Delegate Clark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1096 /CH0786 State Government - Veteran Employment and Transition Success Program Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 786
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1214 Public Safety - Trauma-Affected Veterans Training Program - Establishment Delegate Folden 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1542 /CH0795 Department of Commerce – Employment in the State’s Defense Industry – Study Delegate Lisanti 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 795
Economic Matters
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1760 (SB1165/CH0740) Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprise Participation Delegate Carozza 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0053 /CH0152 (HB0242/CH0153) Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program Fund - Alteration of Program Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/11/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0260 (HB0317) State Lottery – Instant Ticket Lottery Machines – Fraternal Organizations (“Slots” for Homeless Veterans Act) Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0911 Veteran Suicide Prevention - Comprehensive Action Plan Senator Waugh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1118 Public Safety - Trauma-Affected Veterans Training Program - Establishment Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1165 /CH0740 (HB1760) Procurement – Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprise Participation Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 740
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:58 PM