Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Veterinarians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0362 (SB0393)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0413
Title
Income Tax Credit - Veterinary Services for Adopted Police Dogs
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0505
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement - K-9 Law Enforcement Officers Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0605 (SB0163)
Title
Agriculture - Neonicotinoid Pesticide - Labeling Requirement (Pollinator Protection Act of 2015)
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0876
Title
Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Uniform Standards of Operation and Care (Animal Shelter Standards Act of 2015)
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0163 (HB0605)
Title
Agriculture - Neonicotinoid Pesticide - Labeling Requirement (Pollinator Protection Act of 2015)
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0393 (HB0362)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of Costs
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0362 (SB0393) Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of Costs Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
3/04/2015 - 1:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0413 Income Tax Credit - Veterinary Services for Adopted Police Dogs Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0505 Public Safety - Law Enforcement - K-9 Law Enforcement Officers Act Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/04/2015 - 1:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0605 (SB0163) Agriculture - Neonicotinoid Pesticide - Labeling Requirement (Pollinator Protection Act of 2015) Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0876 Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Uniform Standards of Operation and Care (Animal Shelter Standards Act of 2015) Delegate Miele 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0163 (HB0605) Agriculture - Neonicotinoid Pesticide - Labeling Requirement (Pollinator Protection Act of 2015) Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0393 (HB0362) Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of Costs Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM