Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Veterinarians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0216 /CH0412 (SB0269/CH0411)
Title
Emergency Veterinary Care - Immunity From Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0432 (SB0366)
Title
Public Health - Rabies Vaccination Information - Submission to Local Agencies and Use for Licensing
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0481 (SB0578)
Title
State Racing Commission - Equine Medical Director - Employment and Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0602 /CH0787 (SB0422/CH0788)
Title
Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0626 /CH0409
Title
Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Standards of Care and Protocol Implementation and Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243
Title
Income Tax Credit - Veterinary Services for Adopted Government Service Dogs
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1463 /CH0417
Title
Veterinary Practitioners - Animal Cruelty and Animal Fighting - Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0269 /CH0411 (HB0216/CH0412)
Title
Emergency Veterinary Care - Immunity From Liability
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0366 (HB0432)
Title
Public Health - Rabies Vaccination Information - Submission to Local Agencies and Use for Licensing
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0422 /CH0788 (HB0602/CH0787)
Title
Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0578 (HB0481)
Title
State Racing Commission - Equine Medical Director - Employment and Costs
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0216 /CH0412 (SB0269/CH0411) Emergency Veterinary Care - Immunity From Liability Delegate Lam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0432 (SB0366) Public Health - Rabies Vaccination Information - Submission to Local Agencies and Use for Licensing Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0481 (SB0578) State Racing Commission - Equine Medical Director - Employment and Costs Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0602 /CH0787 (SB0422/CH0788) Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017 Delegate Robinson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 787
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0626 /CH0409 Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Standards of Care and Protocol Implementation and Enforcement Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 409
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1243 Income Tax Credit - Veterinary Services for Adopted Government Service Dogs Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1463 /CH0417 Veterinary Practitioners - Animal Cruelty and Animal Fighting - Reporting Delegate Frush 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0269 /CH0411 (HB0216/CH0412) Emergency Veterinary Care - Immunity From Liability Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0366 (HB0432) Public Health - Rabies Vaccination Information - Submission to Local Agencies and Use for Licensing Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0422 /CH0788 (HB0602/CH0787) Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017 Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 788
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0578 (HB0481) State Racing Commission - Equine Medical Director - Employment and Costs Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:53 PM