Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Veterinarians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0652 /CH0678 (SB0471/CH0679)
Title
Agriculture - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs - Limitations and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0471 /CH0679 (HB0652/CH0678)
Title
Agriculture - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs - Limitations and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0652 /CH0678 (SB0471/CH0679) Agriculture - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs - Limitations and Reporting Requirements Delegate Love 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 678
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules
SB0471 /CH0679 (HB0652/CH0678) Agriculture - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs - Limitations and Reporting Requirements Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 679
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Rules
3/05/2019 - 11:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM