Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Violence -see also- Domestic Violence; Harassment; Threats

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0318 (SB0467)
Title
Public Safety - Firearms Disqualifications - Antique Firearm
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0359
Title
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Mental Injury
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0484 (SB0861)
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0608 (SB1011)
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Right to Defend Property
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0906 /CH0628
Title
Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Home Invasion
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1220
Title
Prince George's County - Commission of Crime of Violence in Presence of Minor PG 313-17
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1503
Title
Public Safety - Use of Force De-Escalation Training of Law Enforcement Officers - Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1521
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Commission to Study Firearm Violence - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1661 (SB1191/CH0732)
Title
Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or Attacks
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0467 (HB0318)
Title
Public Safety - Firearms Disqualifications - Antique Firearm
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0524
Title
Criminal Law - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Repeal of Residence Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0561
Title
Public Safety - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Ineligibility
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0706
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Expedited Eviction Proceedings - Notice and Appeals
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0861 (HB0484)
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1011 (HB0608)
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Right to Defend Property
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1191 /CH0732 (HB1661)
Title
Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or Attacks
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0318 (SB0467) Public Safety - Firearms Disqualifications - Antique Firearm Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0359 Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Mental Injury Delegate Angel 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0484 (SB0861) Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0608 (SB1011) Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Right to Defend Property Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0906 /CH0628 Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Home Invasion Delegate Malone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 628
Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1220 Prince George's County - Commission of Crime of Violence in Presence of Minor PG 313-17 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1503 Public Safety - Use of Force De-Escalation Training of Law Enforcement Officers - Reports Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/02/2017 - 3:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1521 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Commission to Study Firearm Violence - Establishment Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1661 (SB1191/CH0732) Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or Attacks Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Ways and Means
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0467 (HB0318) Public Safety - Firearms Disqualifications - Antique Firearm Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0524 Criminal Law - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Repeal of Residence Requirement Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0561 Public Safety - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Ineligibility Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0706 Landlord and Tenant - Expedited Eviction Proceedings - Notice and Appeals Senator Norman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0861 (HB0484) Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1011 (HB0608) Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Right to Defend Property Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1191 /CH0732 (HB1661) Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or Attacks Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 732
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:53 PM