Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vital Records

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0022 (SB0165)
Title
Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services
Sponsor
Delegate Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0529 /CH0376 (SB0463)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprentice Sponsors, Funeral Establishment Licenses, and Supervising Morticians
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0723 /CH0274 (SB0460/CH0273)
Title
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to Practice
Sponsor
Delegate Tarrant
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0857 /CH0644
Title
Estates and Trusts - Posthumously Conceived Child
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1029 (SB0783)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1099 (SB0792)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1202
Title
Health Occupations - Certified Professional Midwives - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1471
Title
Health - Statistics and Records - Electronic Filing of Death Certificates
Sponsor
Delegate Myers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0165 (HB0022)
Title
Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0178
Title
Family Law - Blood or Genetic Test Results - Legal Finding of Paternity
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0460 /CH0273 (HB0723/CH0274)
Title
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to Practice
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0463 (HB0529/CH0376)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprentice Sponsors, Funeral Establishment Licenses, and Supervising Morticians
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0783 (HB1029)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0792 (HB1099)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0022 (SB0165) Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services Delegate Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/17/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0529 /CH0376 (SB0463) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprentice Sponsors, Funeral Establishment Licenses, and Supervising Morticians Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 376
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0723 /CH0274 (SB0460/CH0273) Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to Practice Delegate Tarrant 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0857 /CH0644 Estates and Trusts - Posthumously Conceived Child Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 644
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1029 (SB0783) State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors Delegate Oaks 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1099 (SB0792) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1202 Health Occupations - Certified Professional Midwives - Pilot Program Delegate Kelly, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1471 Health - Statistics and Records - Electronic Filing of Death Certificates Delegate Myers 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0165 (HB0022) Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0178 Family Law - Blood or Genetic Test Results - Legal Finding of Paternity Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0460 /CH0273 (HB0723/CH0274) Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to Practice Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 273
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0463 (HB0529/CH0376) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprentice Sponsors, Funeral Establishment Licenses, and Supervising Morticians Senator Conway 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0783 (HB1029) State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0792 (HB1099) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM