Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vital Records

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0236 (SB0208)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0319
Title
Health General - Birth Certificates - Issuance of Copies
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0402 /CH0399 (SB0314/CH0153)
Title
Health Occupations - State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0661 /CH0608
Title
Health - Statistics and Records - Electronic Filing of Death Certificates
Sponsor
Delegate Myers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1272
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0105 /CH0031
Title
Health - Vital Records - Birth Certificates - Preparation and Filing Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0208 (HB0236)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0314 /CH0153 (HB0402/CH0399)
Title
Health Occupations - State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0236 (SB0208) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0319 Health General - Birth Certificates - Issuance of Copies Delegate Olszewski 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0402 /CH0399 (SB0314/CH0153) Health Occupations - State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors Delegate Oaks 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0661 /CH0608 Health - Statistics and Records - Electronic Filing of Death Certificates Delegate Myers 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1272 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes Delegate Lee 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0105 /CH0031 Health - Vital Records - Birth Certificates - Preparation and Filing Requirements Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31
Finance
1/09/2014 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0208 (HB0236) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0314 /CH0153 (HB0402/CH0399) Health Occupations - State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM