Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vital Records

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0454 (SB0490/CH0497)
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect – Disclosure of Identifying Information
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0569
Title
Vital Statistics and Records – Definition of Licensed Health Care Practitioner – Certified Nurse Midwife, Licensed Clinical Professional Counselor, and Physician Assistant
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1159 /CH0154 (SB0066/CH0155)
Title
Health – Vital Statistics – Veteran and Armed Services Member Suicide Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1326
Title
Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0038 /CH0526
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration – Birth Certificates – Issuance of Copies
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0060
Title
Family Law - Same-Sex Couples - Marital Presumption and Expedited Second Parent Adoption
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0066 /CH0155 (HB1159/CH0154)
Title
Health – Vital Statistics – Veteran and Armed Services Member Suicide Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0266 /CH0083 (HB0716/CH0082)
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission – Mortality Rates of African American Infants and Infants in Rural Areas – Study
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0292 /CH0551
Title
Estates - Administration Exemption - Transfer of Motor Vehicle and Boat Titles
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0490 /CH0497 (HB0454)
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect – Disclosure of Identifying Information
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0454 (SB0490/CH0497) Child Abuse and Neglect – Disclosure of Identifying Information Delegate Moon 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0569 Vital Statistics and Records – Definition of Licensed Health Care Practitioner – Certified Nurse Midwife, Licensed Clinical Professional Counselor, and Physician Assistant Delegate Morales 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1159 /CH0154 (SB0066/CH0155) Health – Vital Statistics – Veteran and Armed Services Member Suicide Reporting Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1326 Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0038 /CH0526 Motor Vehicle Administration – Birth Certificates – Issuance of Copies Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526
Finance
1/17/2018 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0060 Family Law - Same-Sex Couples - Marital Presumption and Expedited Second Parent Adoption Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0066 /CH0155 (HB1159/CH0154) Health – Vital Statistics – Veteran and Armed Services Member Suicide Reporting Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Finance
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0266 /CH0083 (HB0716/CH0082) Maryland Health Care Commission – Mortality Rates of African American Infants and Infants in Rural Areas – Study Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 83
Finance
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0292 /CH0551 Estates - Administration Exemption - Transfer of Motor Vehicle and Boat Titles Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 551
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0490 /CH0497 (HB0454) Child Abuse and Neglect – Disclosure of Identifying Information Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:58 PM