Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vulnerable Adults -see also- Developmental Disabilities; Eld

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0364 (SB0909/CH0425)
Title
Health Care Practitioners - Medical Examinations on Anesthetized or Unconscious Patients
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0485 (SB0475)
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Senior and Vulnerable Adult Asset Recovery Unit
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0561
Title
Criminal Law - Abuse or Neglect of a Vulnerable Adult - Psychological Abuse
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0571 /CH0410 (SB0522/CH0411)
Title
Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0734 /CH0023 (SB0689/CH0024)
Title
Criminal Law - Labor Trafficking (Anti-Exploitation Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1061
Title
Estates and Trusts - Testamentary Instruments - Fraud and Undue Influence
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1076
Title
Criminal Procedure - Out of Court Statements of Victims - Child Neglect and Abuse or Neglect of a Vulnerable Adult
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1384 /CH0741 (SB0677/CH0742)
Title
Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0416
Title
Education - Curriculum - Holocaust and Genocide Unit (Lessons of the Holocaust and Genocide Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0475 (HB0485)
Title
Office of the Attorney General – Senior and Vulnerable Adult Asset Recovery Unit
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0522 /CH0411 (HB0571/CH0410)
Title
Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0677 /CH0742 (HB1384/CH0741)
Title
Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0689 /CH0024 (HB0734/CH0023)
Title
Criminal Law - Labor Trafficking (Anti-Exploitation Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0863
Title
Labor and Employment - Screening for Use of Marijuana or Cannabis
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0909 /CH0425 (HB0364)
Title
Health Care Practitioners - Medical Examinations on Anesthetized or Unconscious Patients
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1027
Title
Criminal Law - Abuse and Neglect of Vulnerable Adults - Notice of Report
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1041
Title
Public Health - Care of Medically Fragile Individuals (Channing's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0364 (SB0909/CH0425) Health Care Practitioners - Medical Examinations on Anesthetized or Unconscious Patients Delegate Bagnall 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0485 (SB0475) Office of the Attorney General - Senior and Vulnerable Adult Asset Recovery Unit Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0561 Criminal Law - Abuse or Neglect of a Vulnerable Adult - Psychological Abuse Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0571 /CH0410 (SB0522/CH0411) Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Revisions Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0734 /CH0023 (SB0689/CH0024) Criminal Law - Labor Trafficking (Anti-Exploitation Act of 2019) Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 23
Judiciary
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1061 Estates and Trusts - Testamentary Instruments - Fraud and Undue Influence Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1076 Criminal Procedure - Out of Court Statements of Victims - Child Neglect and Abuse or Neglect of a Vulnerable Adult Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1384 /CH0741 (SB0677/CH0742) Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents Delegate Bhandari 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 741
Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0416 Education - Curriculum - Holocaust and Genocide Unit (Lessons of the Holocaust and Genocide Act) Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0475 (HB0485) Office of the Attorney General – Senior and Vulnerable Adult Asset Recovery Unit Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0522 /CH0411 (HB0571/CH0410) Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Revisions Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Finance
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0677 /CH0742 (HB1384/CH0741) Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 742
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Health and Government Operations
SB0689 /CH0024 (HB0734/CH0023) Criminal Law - Labor Trafficking (Anti-Exploitation Act of 2019) Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 24
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0863 Labor and Employment - Screening for Use of Marijuana or Cannabis Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0909 /CH0425 (HB0364) Health Care Practitioners - Medical Examinations on Anesthetized or Unconscious Patients Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1027 Criminal Law - Abuse and Neglect of Vulnerable Adults - Notice of Report Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB1041 Public Health - Care of Medically Fragile Individuals (Channing's Law) Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM